+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported favorably without amendment
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reassigned to committee on judiciary and public safety
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 145 Yeas 107 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Read a third time
- Vote reconsidered
- Passed Roll Call # 152 Yeas 108 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Transmitted
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/14/2019
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Julie Alexander
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor