+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-2)
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-2)
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reassigned to committee on judiciary and public safety
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
On September 4, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 184 Yeas 108 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Read a third time
On September 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted and amended
- Read a second time
On August 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/14/2019
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Annette Glenn
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor