+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned PA 39'19 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 06/26/2019 01:41 PM
- Presented to the Governor 06/20/2019 03:40 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 06/26/2019 03:30 PM
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Roll call Roll Call # 123 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Senate substitute (S-3) concurred in
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-3) with immediate effect and title amendment
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 134 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
- Substitute (s-3) adopted
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-2)
- Substitute (s-2) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-2)
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-2)
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-2)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy and human services
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 34 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
- Read a third time
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/14/2019
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Government Operations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Jason Sheppard
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor