+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned PA 186'13 2013 ADDENDA
- Approved by the Governor 12/17/2013 @ 4:04 PM 2013 ADDENDA
- Presented to the Governor 12/17/2013 @ 11:02 AM 2013 ADDENDA
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/17/2013 @ 4:35 PM 2013 ADDENDA
On December 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 657 yeas 37 nays 1 excused 0 not voting 0
- Amendment(s) concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with amendment(s)
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with amendment(s)
- Inserted full title
On December 12, 2013 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Rule suspended
- Senate amendment(s) concurred in Roll Call # 532 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Full title agreed to
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Returned from Senate with amendment(s) with immediate effect and full title
On November 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On October 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on education
On October 23, 2013 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Transmitted
- Passed Roll Call # 349 Yeas 106 Nays 0
On October 22, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Amended
- Read a second time
On October 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 03/01/2013
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Lisa Lyons