+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy and human services
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 82 Yeas 100 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
- Read a third time
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted and amended
- Read a second time
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/24/2021
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Angela Witwer
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor