+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 10, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned PA 121'17 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 10/5/2017 @ 9:24 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/5/2017 @ 11:28 AM
On October 4, 2017 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 10/3/2017 @ 2:41 PM
On September 27, 2017 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On September 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 348 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On September 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Placed on order of third reading
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 179 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/08/2017
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Dave Pagel
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor