+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On July 14, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned PA 112'15 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 7/7/2015 @ 8:35 AM
- Presented to the Governor 7/1/2015 @ 3:34 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 7/7/2015 @ 9:16 AM
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on immediate passage
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Rules suspended
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 335 yeas 25 nays 12 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Rule suspended
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
- Roll Call # 281 Yeas 61 Nays 47
- Full title agreed to
- Bill ordered enrolled
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on education
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 80 Yeas 58 Nays 51
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Transmitted
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 03/12/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Liability Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Lisa Lyons
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor