+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On October 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On October 28, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 391 Yeas 83 Nays 22
- Read a third time
On October 22, 2015 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted and amended
On October 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 03/12/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Criminal Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Peter Lucido
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor