+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 82'18 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 3/20/2018 @ 9:52 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 3/20/2018 @ 10:28 AM
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 3/8/2018 @ 1:48 PM
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on immediate passage
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Rules suspended
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Amendment(s) defeated
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Rule suspended
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
- Roll Call # 126 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Bill ordered enrolled
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 120 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Substitute H-1 adopted and amended
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
- Referred to second reading
- Read a second time
- Read a third time
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 91 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Transmitted
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/07/2017
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Laura Cox
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor