+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 31, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/30/2017 @ 3:26 PM
- Assigned PA 141'17 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 10/29/2017 @ 10:01 AM
On October 24, 2017 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 10/24/2017 @ 10:34 AM
On October 18, 2017 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On October 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 398 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On October 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On October 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on commerce
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 125 Yeas 106 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/02/2017
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Trade
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Bronna Kahle
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor