+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 155 Yeas 91 Nays 16
- Vote reconsidered
- Passed Roll Call # 154 Yeas 90 Nays 16
- Read a third time
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-3 adopted
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-3
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/02/2017
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Law and Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Andy Schor
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor