+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 200 Yeas 89 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
- Read a third time
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/23/2021
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative TC Clements