+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 89 Yeas 92 Nays 17
- Read a third time
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-6 adopted
- Read a second time
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-6
On July 12, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to Committee on Judiciary
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/02/2017
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Jim Runestad
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor