+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 14, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned PA 101'15 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/30/2015 @ 1:30 PM
- Approved by the Governor 6/29/2015 @ 12:48 PM
- Presented to the Governor 6/22/2015 @ 2:30 PM
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 325 yeas 30 nays 7 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on elections and government reform
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 65 Yeas 93 Nays 17
- Read a third time
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-3 adopted
- Read a second time
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-3
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 03/05/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Elections
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Kurt Heise