+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules and Competitiveness
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-3) adopted
- Substitute (H-2) adopted
- Read a second time
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-2)
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/18/2021
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Government Operations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Luke Meerman
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor