+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On October 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
On October 22, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 346 Yeas 97 Nays 11
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On October 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 02/15/2013
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Fred Durhal
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor