+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 114 Yeas 102 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On September 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/26/2019
- Referred to Committee on Families, Children, and Seniors
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Vanessa Guerra
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor