+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 14, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned PA 88'15 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 6/23/2015 @ 3:23 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/23/2015 @ 3:54 PM
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 6/17/2015 @ 10:58 AM
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 245 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 267 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 60 Yeas 110 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 02/26/2015
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Anthony Forlini