+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (39)
On October 8, 2019 in the House:
- Disapproved line item(s) re-referred to Committee on Appropriations
On October 2, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned PA 59'19
- Filed with Secretary of State 09/30/2019 07:24 PM
- Approved by the Governor with line item(s) vetoed 09/29/2019 03:41 PM
- Postponed for the day
On September 26, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 09/27/2019 09:16 AM
On September 24, 2019 in the House:
- Given immediate effect
- Conference report adopted Roll Call # 231 Yeas 63 Nays 45 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Retransmitted
On September 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference report received in senate
- Senate adopted conference report with immediate effect roll call # 233 yeas 23 nays 15 excused 0 not voting 0
On September 24, 2019 in the House:
- Conference report adopted by Senate with immediate effect
- Bill ordered enrolled
On September 17, 2019 in the House:
- Conference report received
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate named conferees 06/20/2019: sens. jon bumstead, jim stamas, sean mccann
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- House conferees named 06/19/2019: Reps. Sue Allor Annette Glenn John D Cherry
- Roll call Roll Call # 142 Yeas 0 Nays 109 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Senate substitute (S-1) nonconcurred in
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
- Rules suspended
- Referred to committee of the whole
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-1)
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Passed roll call # 144 yeas 22 nays 15 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute (H-3) adopted and amended
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Passed Roll Call # 126 Yeas 58 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Transmitted
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-3)
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/26/2019
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Sue Allor
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor