+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (39)
On October 8, 2019 in the House:
- Disapproved line item(s) re-referred to Committee on Appropriations
On October 2, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor with line item(s) vetoed 09/29/2019 03:37 PM
- Presented to the Governor 09/27/2019 11:23 AM
- Postponed for the day
- Filed with Secretary of State 09/30/2019 07:28 PM
- Assigned PA 61'19
On September 24, 2019 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Conference report adopted by Senate with immediate effect
On September 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted conference report with immediate effect roll call # 228 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Conference report received in senate
On September 24, 2019 in the House:
- Given immediate effect
- Conference report adopted Roll Call # 229 Yeas 102 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Conference report received
- Retransmitted
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate named conferees 06/20/2019: sens. tom barrett, jim stamas, adam hollier
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- House conferees named 06/19/2019: Reps. Tommy Brann Sarah Lightner Julie Brixie
- Roll call Roll Call # 140 Yeas 0 Nays 109 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Senate substitute (S-1) nonconcurred in
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-1)
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Passed roll call # 149 yeas 22 nays 15 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Rules suspended
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute (H-3) adopted
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Passed Roll Call # 113 Yeas 58 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
- Transmitted
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-3)
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/26/2019
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Tommy Brann
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor