+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 6, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to Committee on Appropriations
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Conference report received
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to conference committee 05/31/2017
- Senate conferees named 05/31/2017: Sens. Michael Green Peter MacGregor Hoon-Yung Hopgood
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate named conferees 05/31/2017: sens. michael green, peter macgregor, hoon-yung hopgood
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- House conferees named 05/30/2017: Reps. Mary Whiteford Scott VanSingel Yousef Rabhi
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Roll Call # 132 Yeas 0 Nays 107
- Senate substitute S-1 nonconcurred in
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed roll call # 205 yeas 27 nays 11 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1
- Laid over one day under the rules
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Rules suspended
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Passed Roll Call # 105 Yeas 63 Nays 44
- Transmitted
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/15/2017
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Mary Whiteford
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor