+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On August 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reassigned to committee on appropriations
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Referred to committee of the whole
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a second time
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Placed on third reading
- Read a third time
- Passed Roll Call # 119 Yeas 57 Nays 50 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
- Title amended
- Transmitted
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/26/2019
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Scott VanSingel
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor