+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- Re-referred to Committee on Rules and Competitiveness
- Vote reconsidered
- Motion to override veto failed Roll Call # 401 Yeas 62 Nays 47 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor 06/25/2021
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 06/11/2021 10:16 AM
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll call Roll Call # 298 Yeas 102 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Senate substitute (S-1) concurred in
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-1) with immediate effect and full title
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 242 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 25 Yeas 104 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-2) adopted
- Read a second time
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-2)
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/11/2021
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules and Competitiveness
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Sarah Anthony
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor