+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 10, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned PA 43'19 with immediate effect
- Presented to the Governor 06/25/2019 01:24 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 07/08/2019 02:16 PM
- Approved by the Governor 07/08/2019 08:42 AM
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll call Roll Call # 168 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Senate substitute (S-1) concurred in
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 156 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-1) with immediate effect and full title
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy and human services
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 47 Yeas 110 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
- Read a third time
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-2) adopted
- Read a second time
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-2)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-1)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/21/2019
- Referred to Committee on Health Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Bronna Kahle