+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On December 31, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 261'20
- Approved by the Governor 12/29/2020 09:04 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/29/2020 12:54 PM
On December 23, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/22/2020 05:39 PM
On December 21, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll call Roll Call # 645 Yeas 92 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 8
- Senate substitute (S-3) concurred in
- Rule suspended
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-3) with full title
On December 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Substitute (s-3) as amended concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-3) as amended
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-3) and amendment(s)
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed roll call # 592 yeas 35 nays 2 excused 1 not voting 0
- Immediate effect defeated
- Inserted full title
On October 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On August 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy and human services
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 166 Yeas 93 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Transmitted
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-1)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/21/2019
- Referred to Committee on Families, Children, and Seniors
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Scott VanSingel
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor