+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned PA 53'2017 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/15/2017 @ 4:04 PM
- Approved by the Governor 6/15/2017 @ 10:34 AM
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 6/13/2017 @ 12:04 PM
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 245 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 102 Yeas 106 Nays 1
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/15/2017
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Law and Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Peter Lucido
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor