+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned PA 52'17 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 6/15/2017 @ 10:26 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/15/2017 @ 4:02 PM
On June 13, 2017 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 6/8/2017 @ 12:39 PM
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 171 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 228 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 90 Yeas 106 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/15/2017
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Law and Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Peter Lucido
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor