+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On December 28, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned PA 239'17 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/21/2017 @ 2:34 PM
- Approved by the Governor 12/20/2017 @ 1:12 PM
- Presented to the Governor 12/18/2017 @ 11:14 AM
On December 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On December 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 555 yeas 33 nays 4 excused 1 not voting 0
On December 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On December 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On November 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on economic development and international investment
On November 7, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 377 Yeas 83 Nays 24
- Read a third time
On November 2, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Read a second time
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/14/2017
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Trade
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Andy Schor
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor