+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 46'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 03/03/2020 04:04 PM
- Approved by the Governor 03/03/2020 12:39 PM
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 02/24/2020 11:46 AM
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 65 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Amendment(s) defeated
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
On December 11, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 352 Yeas 72 Nays 35 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Read a third time
On December 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-2) adopted
- Read a second time
On December 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-2)
On September 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-2)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/19/2019
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Lynn Afendoulis
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor