+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On December 1, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned PA 192'15 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 11/16/2015 @ 1:44 PM
- Approved by the Governor 11/16/2015 @ 10:12 AM
On November 10, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 11/9/2015 @ 2:26 PM
On November 4, 2015 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 413 Yeas 101 Nays 6
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On October 29, 2015 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
On October 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 470 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
On October 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On September 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on economic development
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 57 Yeas 107 Nays 3
- Read a third time
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Read a second time
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 02/13/2015
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Trade
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Al Pscholka
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor