+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 8, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned PA 135'15 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/7/2015 @ 4:34 PM
- Approved by the Governor 10/6/2015 @ 8:16 AM
On October 6, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 10/2/2015 @ 2:20 PM
On September 30, 2015 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On September 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 384 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On September 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on insurance
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 54 Yeas 108 Nays 2
- Read a third time
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 02/13/2015
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Insurance
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Aric Nesbitt
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor