+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 53'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 3/6/2018 @ 3:50 PM
- Approved by the Governor 3/6/2018 @ 11:28 AM
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 2/26/2018 @ 1:14 PM
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 103 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 172 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/09/2017
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Martin Howrylak