+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 279'18 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 6/28/2018 @ 7:10 AM
- Presented to the Governor 6/25/2018 @ 3:26 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/29/2018 @ 11:02 AM
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 499 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Inserted full title
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
- Full title agreed to
- Bill ordered enrolled
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-3 adopted and amended
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 451 Yeas 102 Nays 6
- Transmitted
On May 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-3
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/09/2017
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative John Bizon
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor