+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On October 22, 2015 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On October 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 462 yeas 30 nays 7 excused 1 not voting 0
On October 22, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
On October 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1 as amended
- Substitute s-1 as amended concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1 and amendment(s)
On September 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on elections and government reform
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 196 Yeas 91 Nays 19
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Read a second time
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 02/12/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Amanda Price