+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On December 31, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 259'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/29/2020 12:50 PM
- Approved by the Governor 12/29/2020 09:00 AM
On December 23, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/22/2020 05:33 PM
On December 16, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll call Roll Call # 524 Yeas 106 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
- Senate substitute (S-1) concurred in
On December 15, 2020 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-1) with immediate effect and full title
On December 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 532 yeas 33 nays 5 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1) as amended
- Substitute (s-1) as amended concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1) and amendment(s)
On September 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on economic and small business development
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 220 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
- Read a third time
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-2) adopted
- Read a second time
On May 19, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-2)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/06/2019
- Referred to Committee on Local Government and Municipal Finance
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Brandt Iden
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor