+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 277 Yeas 83 Nays 26
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-5 adopted
- Read a second time
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-5
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/02/2017
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Peter Lucido
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor