+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
On November 13, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 579 Yeas 90 Nays 17
- Read a third time
On November 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Read a second time
On September 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 02/01/2013
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Earl Poleski