+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 44 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/02/2017
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Michigan Competitveness
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Vanessa Guerra
+ − Sponsors (64)
Type:
Primary Sponsor