+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On December 3, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned PA 171'13 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 11/18/2013 @ 9:52 AM
- Presented to the Governor 11/15/2013 @ 2:07 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 11/18/2013 @ 1:17 PM
On November 12, 2013 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 395 Yeas 97 Nays 13
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On November 6, 2013 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
On November 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 492 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On November 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On October 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 161 Yeas 97 Nays 11
- Read a third time
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Read a second time
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 02/01/2013
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Phil Potvin
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor