+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 125 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Read a third time
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/04/2021
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Kevin Coleman
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor