+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reassigned to committee on judiciary and public safety
On October 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed Roll Call # 61 Yeas 102 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
- Read a third time
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/06/2019
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative David LaGrand
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor