+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned PA 24'17 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 5/4/2017 @ 3:20 PM
- Approved by the Governor 5/4/2017 @ 9:08 AM
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 4/24/2017 @ 10:42 AM
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 107 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 47 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/01/2017
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Ben Frederick
+ − Sponsors (72)
Type:
Primary Sponsor