+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned PA 32'15 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 5/20/2015 @ 1:14 PM
- Presented to the Governor 5/14/2015 @ 3:16 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 5/20/2015 @ 1:42 PM
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 138 Yeas 84 Nays 26
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 160 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 30 Yeas 85 Nays 25
- Read a third time
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted and amended
- Read a second time
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 02/04/2015
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Criminal Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Kurt Heise
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor