+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on elections
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 240 Yeas 65 Nays 44 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Read a third time
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Placed on third reading
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary, with substitute (H-1)
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/04/2021
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Elections and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Ann Bollin