+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned PA 16'19 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 05/23/2019 08:26 AM
- Approved by the Governor 05/22/2019 03:53 PM
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 05/10/2019 12:15 PM
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 56 yeas 35 nays 3 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 19 Yeas 108 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/06/2019
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Kyra Harris Bolden