+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned PA 13'2019 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 05/23/2019 08:20 AM
- Approved by the Governor 05/22/2019 03:47 PM
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 05/10/2019 12:09 PM
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 53 yeas 35 nays 3 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 16 Yeas 104 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-3) adopted
- Read a second time
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-3)
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/06/2019
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Beau LaFave