+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned PA 34'21 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 06/24/2021 11:06 AM
- Approved by the Governor 06/24/2021 08:21 AM
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 06/11/2021 10:22 AM
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Roll call Roll Call # 299 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Senate substitute (S-1) concurred in
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-1) with immediate effect
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 248 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors, and veterans
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 47 Yeas 108 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Read a third time
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/04/2021
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Military, Veterans and Homeland Security
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Annette Glenn
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor