+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned PA 24'19 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 06/18/2019 01:42 PM
- Approved by the Governor 06/18/2019 11:23 AM
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 06/06/2019 09:28 AM
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 124 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on local government
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 9 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Read a third time
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 01/29/2019
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government and Municipal Finance
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Luke Meerman
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor