+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On August 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 249'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/28/2018 @ 2:30 PM
- Approved by the Governor 6/27/2018 @ 10:14 PM
- Presented to the Governor 6/20/2018 @ 1:42 PM
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 535 Yeas 81 Nays 28
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 414 yeas 27 nays 9 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 231 Yeas 76 Nays 33
- Read a third time
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-3 adopted
- Read a second time
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-3
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 01/31/2017
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Eric Leutheuser
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor