+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 7, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to Committee on Appropriations
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Conference report received
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to conference committee 05/21/2015
- Senate conferees named 05/21/2015: Sens. Darwin Booher Tonya Schuitmaker David Knezek
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate named conferees 05/20/2015: sens. darwin booher, tonya schuitmaker, david knezek
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- House conferees named 05/20/2015: Reps. Paul Muxlow John Bizon Henry Yanez
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Roll Call # 159 Yeas 0 Nays 109
- Senate substitute S-1 nonconcurred in
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Placed on immediate passage
- Inserted full title
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with full title
- Laid over one day under the rules
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 190 yeas 27 nays 10 excused 1 not voting 0
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Rules suspended
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
- Referred to second reading
- Read a second time
- Read a third time
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed Roll Call # 117 Yeas 103 Nays 7
- Title amended
- Transmitted
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 01/29/2015
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Al Pscholka
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor